Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST ALDHELM'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 1059507
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 26 September 2019 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 30 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required