Financial history ELMTREE SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1059524
Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £53.65k £36.48k £25.67k £22.24k £10.60k
Total expenditure £45.32k £27.60k £21.08k £18.18k £16.47k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A