Financial history BASINGSTOKE SILVER BAND

Charity number: 1059563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.73k £1.21k £1.47k £1.07k £778
Total expenditure £3.21k £3.12k £1.49k £1.08k £1.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A