Financial history THE THREE GUINEAS TRUST

Charity number: 1059652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £1.63m £1.53m £1.65m £1.87m £1.87m
Total expenditure £1.74m £1.42m £1.53m £4.11m £2.31m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.25m £1.13m £1.25m £1.44m £1.56m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £1.13m £1.25m £0 £1.56m
Income - Investment £381.90k £404.09k £401.58k £428.93k £291.16k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £14.55k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.63m £1.30m £1.42m £4.03m £2.23m
Expenditure - Raising funds £107.10k £118.67k £109.45k £81.91k £82.91k
Expenditure - Governance £7.27k £3.71k £6.58k £6.58k £9.54k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.51m £1.20m £1.25m £3.88m £2.04m
Expenditure - Investment management £107.10k £118.67k £109.45k £81.91k £82.91k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0