HAPPY DOGS

Charity number: 1059695
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £107.85k £91.21k £50.76k £303.48k £91.21k
Total expenditure £98.77k £86.65k £67.65k £81.97k £88.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A