AMBER COMMUNITIES TRUST

Charity number: 1059704
Charity reporting is overdue by 596 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2014 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018
Total gross income £1.68k £1.20k £1.20k £1.20k £1.30k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £25 £60
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A