THE FINNISH SATURDAY SCHOOL IN CAMBERLEY

Charity number: 1059715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 21 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 10 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2016 26 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2016 Not Required