THE FINNISH SATURDAY SCHOOL IN CAMBERLEY

Charity number: 1059715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £8.87k £10.62k £10.01k £7.15k £877
Total expenditure £6.98k £10.31k £8.60k £6.43k £877
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A