THE GLENDALE GATEWAY TRUST

Charity number: 1059761
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 February 2019 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 17 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 20 July 2016 On time Download