THE GLENDALE GATEWAY TRUST

Charity number: 1059761
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Shirley Mills Trustee 21 November 2018 None on record
Dr Julian Bales Trustee 16 July 2014 None on record
Becci Murray Trustee 26 October 2020 None on record
Siobhan Patricia Younger Trustee 20 January 2021 None on record
Patrick James Sheard Chair 06 December 2015 None on record
Cindy Louise Wait Trustee 28 August 2019 None on record