AKT OUTPOST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide housing, support, advice, and opportunities to take part in a variety of activities. This support is for anyone who is aged between 16 and 25 and who identifies as lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender or think they might be.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 12 December 1996: Standard registration
- 24 August 2016: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 24 August 2016: Funds transferred to 1093815 THE ALBERT KENNEDY TRUST
- THE OUTPOST HOUSING PROJECT (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 30/04/2013 | 30/04/2014 | 30/04/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180.20k | £190.66k | £228.89k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £164.33k | £213.16k | £243.18k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2015 | 14 July 2016 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2014 | 07 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2013 | 16 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2013 | 16 December 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/08/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/10/1996 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/05/2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE LESBIAN AND GAY YOUNG PERSONS AGED SIXTEEN YEARS OR OVER IN CONDITIONS OF NEED,HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF TEMPORARY HOMES FOR SUCH YOUNG PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF AND BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND OTHER FORMS OF ASSISTANCE FOR SUCH YONG PERSONS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTISE THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window