TOWER HAMLETS PARENTS CENTRE

Charity number: 1059773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 15 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 15 November 2016 On time Download