TOWER HAMLETS PARENTS CENTRE

Charity number: 1059773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £111.33k £142.69k £165.87k £159.31k £123.97k
Total expenditure £106.48k £136.14k £158.43k £147.84k £124.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.45k £10.00k N/A £11.05k £5.53k