MIDLAND INDIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1059780
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 21 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 January 2017 On time Download