MIDLAND INDIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1059780
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £65.40k £49.25k £53.85k £67.92k £69.90k
Total expenditure £45.83k £30.06k £50.68k £60.28k £82.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A