Financial history SHEKINAH CHRISTIAN CHURCH PENZANCE TRUST

Charity number: 1059804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £116.11k £111.58k £113.09k £117.41k £112.62k
Total expenditure £90.94k £105.59k £112.73k £102.53k £117.41k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A