THE FRIENDS OF THE FIVE PARISHES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends are dedicated to helping preserve the fabric of the church buildings of broxted, tilty, great easton and little easton for the benefit of future generations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 18 December 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WARWICK JOHN NEWBURY | Chair | 15 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hebblewhite Ward | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Alison Armitage | Trustee | 15 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA MARY HARBOTTLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER NEALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AUDREY MILLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW CONNEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.97k | £3.73k | £4.61k | £5.06k | £5.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.31k | £17.23k | £5.69k | £6.27k | £10.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 04 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 SEPTEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE MAINTENANCE REPAIR RESTORATION IMPROVEMENT PRESERVATION BEAUTIFICATION EXTENSION AND RECONSTRUCTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCHES OF BROXTED TILTY GREAT EASTON AND LITTLE EASTON THEIR MONUMENTS AND FIXTURES FITTINGS FURNITURE STAINED GLASS ORNAMENTS AND OTHER CHATTELS AND THEIR CHURCHYARDS
Area of benefit
CHELMSFORD DIOCESE
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 St. Edmunds Croft
Dunmow
CM6 3AZ
- Phone:
- 01371876707
- Email:
- harbottleangela@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window