THE ORLANDO CHAMBER CHOIR

Charity number: 1059881
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katherine Elizabeth Rosamund Newman Trustee 03 October 2019 None on record
Maxime Rischard Trustee 08 October 2020 None on record
Bettina Weichert Trustee 13 November 2013 None on record
Emily Clare Louise McDonald Chair 22 October 2015 None on record
Dr Daniel Bamford Trustee 13 October 2017 None on record