Financial history LONGTON DIVISION, GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1059962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £4.77k £4.76k £10.69k £5.75k £4.17k
Total expenditure £13.09k £10.88k £15.96k £8.20k £5.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A