Accounts and annual returns ST JOHN'S CHURCH HANLEY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1060066
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 308 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 308 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 673 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 673 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1038 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1038 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1404 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1404 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1769 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1769 days