ST JOHN'S CHURCH HANLEY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1060066
Charity reporting is overdue by 1693 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £65 £13.55k £18 £3 £942
Total expenditure £3.26k £4.51k £4.48k £4.24k £1.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A