Trustees BATH AND NORTH EAST SOMERSET CARERS CENTRE

Charity number: 1060080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Francis John Joseph Mowat Trustee 06 April 2022
None on record
Dr Gillian Austen Trustee 24 February 2022
None on record
Katherine Burfitt Trustee 24 February 2022
None on record
KENNETH LITTLEWOOD Trustee 28 November 2019
FIRST STEPS (BATH)
Received: On time
FilmBath LTD
Received: On time
Paul John Richards Trustee 28 November 2019
None on record
Gordon Christopher John Westwood Trustee 30 November 2018
None on record
Barry Hulme Trustee 07 October 2016
None on record
Jennifer Theed Trustee 20 February 2014
None on record
Christine Bone Trustee 09 January 2014
None on record