SUPPORTING PEOPLE ACHIEVING REAL CHOICE

Charity number: 1060095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joe Tottey Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
Daniel Moore Trustee 15 December 2016 None on record
Scott McGhee Trustee 15 December 2016 None on record
Kyle Benson Trustee 15 December 2016 None on record
John Campbell Trustee 27 January 2014 None on record
SARAH MCKEOWN Trustee None on record
Philip James Haden Trustee 07 November 2018 None on record
MICHAEL O'GORMAN Chair 24 February 1995 None on record
Kenneth Dobson Trustee 24 February 2019 None on record
Tanya Houghton Trustee 15 December 2016 None on record
Stephen Roberts Trustee 27 January 2014 None on record