THE VILLAGE HALL BRANSTON

Charity number: 1060096
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General fund raising for the village hall by dog shows, bike ride, charity support etc.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 January 1997: Standard registration
  • 29 May 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BRANSTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £1.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 January 2020 356 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 February 2018 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required