Accounts and annual returns PAPPA FUND

Charity number: 1060188
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 15 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 03 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 28 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 845 days
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required