ST KEW COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1060224
Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 118 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 118 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 483 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 483 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 November 2019 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 23 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 10 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required