KNAPHILL CHURCHES TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operation of the King's House Coffee Shop as a restaurant cum drop-in centre with counselling facilities. Has been used for alpha courses and youth evenings, e.g. chill & chat. Also used by local police/PCSOs & councillor for monthly drop-in sessions for the public needing assistance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 04 February 1997: Standard registration
- 14 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE KING'S HOUSE COFFEE SHOP (Working name)
- THE KINGS' HOUSE COFFEE SHOP (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2010 | 31/10/2011 | 31/10/2012 | 31/10/2013 | 30/11/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.19k | £83.47k | £66.98k | £60.78k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.71k | £66.66k | £69.78k | £62.18k | £13 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2014 | 16 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2014 | 14 December 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2013 | 16 December 2014 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2013 | 14 December 2014 | 105 days late | |
Annual return | 31 October 2012 | 13 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2012 | 19 August 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2011 | 07 August 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2011 | 07 August 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25/1/96
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF RELIGIOUS OR OTHER EDUCATION. TO SUPPLY COFFEE AND OTHER REFRESHMENTS AND FOOD FOR THE USE AND CONSUMPTION OF PERSONS IN KNAPHILL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA SO AS TO STIMULATE SUCH PERSONS INTEREST IN THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. THE RELIEF OF THE AGED POOR OR DISABLED. GENERALLY TO PURSUE THESE OBJECTS BY WORKING WITH OTHER CHRISTIANS IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANY CHRISTIAN OR OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT NOT INCONSISTENT WITH THE FOREGOING.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window