2ND AND 7TH WELWYN GARDEN CITY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1060288
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £12.48k £11.65k £12.62k £5.74k £5.69k
Total expenditure £13.12k £10.56k £12.23k £6.68k £8.72k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A