GRACE FLORA RANDALL TRUST

Charity number: 1060324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trustees make grant to pupils and former pupils of Rugby High School, Rugby going on to further education

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £276,660
Total expenditure: £10,494

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 January 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Horton Trustee 15 January 2021
None on record
Linda Ann Jones Trustee 15 January 2021
None on record
CHRISTOPHER STUART PRATT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £1.38k £1.46k £1.19k £1.15k £276.66k
Total expenditure £535 £2.29k £1.20k £2.13k £10.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 15 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 15 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Brethertons
Franklins House
Manorsfield Road
BICESTER
Oxfordshire
OX26 6EX
Phone:
01295270999
Website:

No information available