FULL POTENTIAL ARTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Full Potential Arts provides advocacy, support and creative services to people facing adverse Mental Health and works with partners, statutory authorities and other charities to increase awareness of mental health issues. The charity actively seeks out opportunities to engage with other organisations that directly delivery to families and individuals to support and inform mental health outcomes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 24 January 1997: Standard registration
- 28 February 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 28 February 2017: Funds transferred to 208231 SCOPE
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.09k | £32.03k | £4.75k | £17.71k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.30k | £34.38k | £21.73k | £1.60k | £5.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 18 May 2016 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 23 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 13 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 DECEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEED OR DISABILITY OF PERSONS WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT SUFFERING ANY IMPAIRMENT TO THEIR MENTAL OR PHYSICAL FACULTIES
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window