ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHDO CHURCH ST MARY OF DEBRE TSION

Charity number: 1060394
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is overdue by 35 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 35 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 35 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 02 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 17 February 2017 On time Download