ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHDO CHURCH ST MARY OF DEBRE TSION

Charity number: 1060394
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is overdue by 35 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £144.43k £126.04k £133.04k £140.52k £112.04k
Total expenditure £146.01k £247.66k £264.09k £128.47k £76.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A