GUNATIT MISSION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROMOTE HINDU RELIGION BY PROPOGATING TEACHINGS OF LORD SWAMINAYRAN AND GUNATITANAND SWAMI
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
- Leicestershire
- Northamptonshire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 31 January 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHILA POPAT | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr NAINA VISANI | Trustee |
|
||||||
KALPANA VISANI | Trustee |
|
||||||
ILA VAGHELA | Trustee |
|
||||||
DILIPKUMAR BHOJANI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VIMLABEN SURESHCHANDRA PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MINAKSHIBEN HITTASCHANDRA PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ARUNA DILIPKUMAR BHOJANI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAMNIKLAL KALIDAS KOTECHA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.51k | £30.47k | £13.80k | £20.29k | £28.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.71k | £3.99k | £5.84k | £13.60k | £27.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 26TH JANUARY 1997
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HINDU RELIGION FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BY PROPAGATING THE PHILOSOPHIES AND TEACHINGS OF LORD SWAMINARAYAN AND GUNATATITANAND SWAMI AS PROPOUNDED BY "GUNATIT JYOT MAHILA TRUST VALLABH VIDYANGAR INDIA"
Contact information
- Address:
-
A J SHAH & CO
8 PINNER VIEW
HARROW
HA1 4QA
- Phone:
- 02084272594
- Email:
- anil@ajshahandco.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window