Financial history CHRISTIAN LIFE CHURCH (BRADFORD) TRUST

Charity number: 1060464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £162.37k £169.95k £199.49k £185.68k £171.02k
Total expenditure £176.10k £170.02k £179.62k £171.20k £170.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A