Financial history BOURNEMOUTH GUIDE CAMP ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1060476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £58.38k £34.76k £35.00k £44.08k £34.10k
Total expenditure £37.51k £28.44k £46.49k £48.15k £38.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.00k £0 N/A N/A £11.33k