LLANASA VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1060495
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gwynfor Parry Trustee 01 June 2017 None on record
Sue Kirkby Trustee 30 October 2013 None on record
Helen Frances Haley Trustee 05 June 2018 None on record
DAVID BROWN Chair 08 April 2013 None on record
EMMA ELIZABETH HUGHES Trustee None on record
LYN JONES Trustee None on record
ROBERT KIRKBY Trustee None on record
DIANNE ROSEMARY GILL Trustee
TRAVELLING UNDER THE STARS Overdue by 1694 days
NORTH WALES MEDICAL TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
Harry John Haley Trustee 05 June 2018 None on record
PAULINE MCILVEEN Trustee 01 July 2016 None on record
MARGARET MARY BARR Trustee
BRYN A MÔR MISSION AREA Received: On time
MRS ANN JOHNSON Trustee None on record
Tim Roberts Trustee 07 April 2021 None on record
JANICE HOOPER WILLIAMS Trustee None on record