THE FRIENDS OF RANELAGH SCHOOL, BRACKNELL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advances the education of the pupils at Ranelagh School, Bracknell through the provision of facilities and equipment which are not normally State funded.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bracknell Forest
Governance
- 05 February 1997: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF RANELAGH (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT MCLEAN | Chair | 20 August 2012 |
|
|||||
Timothy Griffith | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Whiteside Tomkins | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Louise Hodkinson | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Williams | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Clow | Trustee | 11 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
GRANT CUNNINGHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.48k | £55.23k | £48.18k | £39.21k | £29.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.17k | £21.11k | £89.17k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/07/1996 AS AMENDED ON 29/01/1997 AS AMENDED ON 14/07/2007 AS AMENDED ON 14/07/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT RANELAGH SCHOOL, BRACKNELL ("THE SCHOOL") THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT WHICH ARE NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY GOVERNMENT FUNDING.
Area of benefit
RANELAGH SCHOOL, BRACKNELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
RANELAGH SCHOOL
RANELAGH DRIVE
BRACKNELL
RG12 9DA
- Phone:
- 01344 421233
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window