Trustees LEAMINGTON DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 1060574
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Benjamin Oliver Steele Trustee 15 April 2021
None on record
MANDY JAYNE HUGHES Trustee 04 November 2020
None on record
CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL WYNNE Trustee 04 November 2020
12TH LEAMINGTON (HOLY TRINITY) SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Andrew Michael Law Trustee 04 November 2020
None on record
MARK NICHOLAS PAYNE Trustee 14 October 2017
None on record
Michael James Hepburn Trustee 18 October 2016
None on record
Ian James Welch Trustee 18 October 2016
None on record
Brian Friar Trustee 01 January 2014
RADFORD SEMELE COMMUNITY HALL AND PAVILION
Received: On time
Gordon Ian Ferguson Trustee
2ND SOUTHAM (OPEN) SCOUT GROUP
THE CITY OF COVENTRY CORPS OF DRUMS
Overdue by 76 days