SOUTHAMPTON INSTITUTE EDUCATIONAL COMPANY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Leasing arrangements of the Michael Andrews Building, which enhance the provision of facilities for the students of Southampton Solent University.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Southampton City
Governance
- 07 February 1997: Standard registration
- 13 August 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2004 | 31/07/2005 | 31/07/2006 | 31/07/2007 | 31/07/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £408.65k | £408.61k | £408.35k | £408.68k | £408.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £411.89k | £406.98k | £407.04k | £407.04k | £429.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | 30 April 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | 14 May 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | 11 March 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | 19 May 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | 23 April 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | 18 May 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2005 | 26 May 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2005 | 07 June 2006 | 7 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2004 | 15 April 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2004 | 15 April 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AT THE SOUTHAMPTON INSTITUTE, A CHARITY, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE USE OF STUDENTS AT THE SOUTHAMPTON INSTITUTE. 2) TO MAKE GRANTS TO OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMPANY SHALL IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE AT SUCH TIMES AS THE COMPANY SHALL IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
SOUTHAMPTON INSTITUTE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window