Accounts and annual returns ANGLICAN CHURCH PLANTING INITIATIVES

Charity number: 1060703
Charity reporting is up to date (32 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 December 2021 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required