THE TRIANGLE HEALING TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the charity are to relieve the sick, and in particular, cancer sufferers by the provision of holistic and natural therapies; to protect and preserve health by the provision of a counselling service to persons suffering from severe stress, shock or depression which threatens their mental and emotional stability or physical health; to advance public education in holistic therapies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 20 February 1997: Standard registration
- 27 November 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 27 November 2009: Funds transferred to 1121915 CANCER JOURNEY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.14k | £40.30k | £31.47k | £43.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.57k | £37.52k | £30.32k | £32.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 27 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 27 October 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 31 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 03 October 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 31 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 31 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 05 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 05 October 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ON INCORPORATED 28/1/97.
Charitable objects
[1] TO RELIEVE THE SICK, AND, IN PARTICULAR, CANCER SUFFERES, BY THE PROVISION OF HOLISTIC AND NATURAL THERAPIES; [2] TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF A COUNSELLING SERVICE TO PERSONS SUFFERING FROM SEVERE STRESS, SHOCK OR DEPRESSION, WHICH THREATENS THEIR MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL STABILITY OR PHYSICAL HEALTH; AND [3] TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN HOLISTIC THERAPIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES INCLUDING A LIBRARY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window