THE MANCHESTER ACADEMY TRUST

Charity number: 1060791
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supporting Manchester Academy and Harris College in the University of Oxford for the following purposes (1) To advance the Christian religion in its simplest and most intelligible form, in particular through the education and training of ministers and lay leaders and research into unitarianism and dissent (2) To support the college chapel.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £20,818
Total expenditure: £14,254

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 February 1997: Standard registration
  • 12 October 2011: Funds received from 1046732 ERIC PRICE TRAVEL BURSARY TRUST
  • 13 April 2023: Funds received from 226803 THORNTON FUND
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • MANCHESTER ACADEMY FUND (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher John Charles Whitehouse Trustee 21 June 2022
THE C J C WHITEHOUSE 2006 CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
MANCHESTER COLLEGE OXFORD CHAPEL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Rev. Dr. Claire Helen MacDonald Trustee 21 June 2022
None on record
Dr DAVID WYKES Trustee
UNITARIAN HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE BRITISH AND FOREIGN UNITARIAN ASSOCIATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £10.59k £7.29k £11.09k £141.31k £20.82k
Total expenditure £7.61k £824 £1.85k £6.15k £14.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 16 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 25 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 25 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 18 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 13 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 18 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
22A TEMPLAR ROAD
OXFORD
OX2 8LT
Phone:
01865-557888
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available