Financial history TRINITY FIELDS TRUST

Charity number: 1060813
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £313.76k £277.38k £260.69k £241.54k £252.23k
Total expenditure £200.88k £193.97k £184.87k £212.48k £345.49k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £25.00k N/A