Trustees TRINITY FIELDS TRUST

Charity number: 1060813
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN ERIK SAMUELSON Trustee 02 March 2022
None on record
Benjamin Freeman Trustee 21 April 2021
None on record
ANDREW JAMES PEGGIE Trustee 24 September 2020
None on record
Neil Allcock Trustee 24 September 2020
None on record
MARK PETERS Trustee 10 September 2017
None on record
David Thomas Wilson Trustee 04 December 2013
None on record
MARK DYER Trustee
None on record