THE ROMANIAN AID FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1060828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 21 February 2017 On time Download