Trustees THE INNER CITY CENTRE
Charity number: 1060874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alistair Park | Chair | 17 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rose Baring | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aneta Stamenova | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Nicole Strang | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Clare | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil William Farrelly | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Baker | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Colin John Ralph | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.