PHOENIX SOCIAL ENTERPRISE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Phoenix Social Enterprise Ltd provides employment, education and training opportunities in the UK and Europe. We also conference facilities and rented offices, focus on building the capacity of individuals and organisations underpinned by a philosophy of equality and human rights. We cater for people aged 16-65, people from Black and Minority Ethnic (BME) communities, but not exclusively.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 26 February 1997: Standard registration
- BDA (Working name)
- BLACK DEVELOPMENT AGENCY LIMITED (Previous name)
- BRISTOL BLACK VOLUNTARY SECTOR DEVELOPMENT UNIT LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Reynolds | Trustee | 08 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Anndeloris Chacon | Trustee | 08 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
GUY REID-BAILEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £271.44k | £468.99k | £448.59k | £799.23k | £415.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.28k | £483.84k | £510.38k | £779.05k | £382.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £225.34k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £573.89k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.83k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.08k | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £13.49k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.85k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £19.21k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £560.11k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £218.94k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
17 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
05 February 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/02/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/04/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28/03/2012
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MEMBERS OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS MANAGED BY AFRICAN, AFRO-CARIBBEAN, ASIAN, CHINESE, AND OTHER ETHNIC MINORITY GROUPS, ESPECIALLY THOSE WHO ARE DISCRIMINATED AGAINST ON THE BASIS OF COLOUR, RACE, OR NATIONALITY. B) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE PURPOSES AND WORK OF VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS WITHIN BRISTOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS OF BATH, NORTH-EAST SOMERSET, NORTH SOMERSET AND GLOUCESTERSHIRE. C) TO PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY AND GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL AND CULTURAL IDENTITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Russell Town Avenue
Redfield
Bristol
BS5 9LT
- Phone:
- 0117 939 6645
- Email:
- ops@psebristol.com.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window