32ND WARRINGTON WEST (ST PHILIPS WESTBROOK) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1060997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £15.32k £3.26k £8.32k £9.21k £8.98k
Total expenditure £14.09k £5.52k £9.86k £9.19k £4.85k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A