32ND WARRINGTON WEST (ST PHILIPS WESTBROOK) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1060997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian Matthew Stranack Trustee 14 March 2014 None on record
Andy Fisher Chair 01 July 2018 None on record
Jacqueline Fisher Trustee 30 June 2019 None on record
Tricia Brown Trustee 14 March 2014 None on record
Andrea Claire Lewis Trustee 12 May 2021
ANIMAL CANCER TRUST Received: 16 days late
Lynn Erica Reardon Trustee 15 June 2020 None on record
Anthony John Walton Trustee 30 June 2019 None on record
Allan Lawrence Ralston Trustee 30 June 2019 None on record
Alastair Aitken Brown Trustee 14 March 2014 None on record
CHRIS RALSTON Trustee
SANKEY VALLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Lee Marc Herridge Trustee 15 June 2020 None on record
Ewan Michael Brown Trustee 15 June 2020 None on record