CHAIM CHARITABLE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 1061008
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £529.59k £509.55k £652.17k £562.24k £512.22k
Total expenditure £529.85k £539.11k £603.49k £573.48k £444.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £529.59k £509.55k £652.17k £562.24k £512.22k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £515.67k £533.97k £575.89k £557.37k £436.05k
Expenditure - Raising funds £14.18k £5.14k £27.60k £16.11k £8.28k
Expenditure - Governance £1.06k £1.08k £1.77k £2.04k £1.92k
Expenditure - Grants institution £347.01k £428.74k £389.70k £363.74k £283.89k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0